HI SB2913 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - (S) The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - (S) The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii community development authority to ensure that the Kakaako Makai master plan remains a product of the community-based planning process.
Title
Hawaii Community Development Authority; Kakaako Makai; Master Plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | (S) The committee on WTL deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-10 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) Referred to WTL. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2913&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2913_.HTM |