HI SB2912 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the driver of a vehicle to safely proceed through an intersection in which a defective or malfunctioning trafficcontrol device fails to detect the vehicle and stays in the red signal stage through 2 cycles of the traffic-control device.
Title
Relating To Traffic Control.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | The committee on TRE deferred the measure. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-18 1:45PM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRE, JDC. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2217 (Same As) 2018-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2912&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2912_.HTM |