HI SB2910 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a $50,000,000 revolving line of credit sub-fund under the umbrella of the Green Energy Market Securitization Loan Fund for any state agency or department to finance energy efficiency measures. Establishes the Grid Resiliency Loan Program and a Grid Resiliency Task Force to prepare the State's electrical grid for natural disasters and other emergencies. Establishes a Grid Resiliency Loan Special Fund to provide funding for critical infrastructure. (SB2910 HD1)
Title
Relating To Electric Grid Resiliency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 225. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-26 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 812). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Baker, Wakai Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Takumi, Lowen Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 602). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1964-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1336-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno. |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:15PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1191-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane, McDermott. |
2018-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-15-18 8:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-18. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-13-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 358) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2843) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from TRE/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2383) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE/CPH, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRE/ETT/CPH, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2249 (Same As) 2018-04-26 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 225.