HI SB2904 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a schedule of penalties for employees and holders of retail tobacco permits or persons registered to sell electronic cigarette smoking devices who illegally sell tobacco products and electronic smoking devices to persons under twenty-one years of age. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Sale Of Tobacco Products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2607) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/JDC, WAM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2348 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).