HI SB2903 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Bans the sale of flavored tobacco products. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Flavored Tobacco Products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 429) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3119) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-20 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from CPH/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2840) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-20 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/JDC, WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2347 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).