HI SB2894 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 10:00AM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 10:00AM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Hawaii Health Insurance Programs in the DLIR as a temporary, transitional measure to preserve federal funding, preserve the Hawaii Prepaid Health Care Act, and comply with insurance exchange and other requirements of the Affordable Care Act. Authorizes and funds additional positions in the DLIR and DHS. Transfers assets and functions of the Hawaii Health Connector to DLIR. (SB2894 HD3)
Title
Hawaii Health Insurance Programs; State Health Insurance Exchange; Department of Labor and Industrial Relations; Department of Human Services; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-16 3:15pm in conference room 016. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda Co-Chairs; Kidani. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Nakashima, McKelvey, Luke Co-Chairs; Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 588). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ing, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1643-16) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1267-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Oshiro. |
2016-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-23-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-16 at 2:00 PM. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-21-16 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4). |
2016-03-18 | House | Reported from HLT/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1077-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2016-03-16 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Ichiyama, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har, Johanson, LoPresti. |
2016-03-16 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-03-14 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/LAB on Wednesday, 03-16-16 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to HLT/LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 292) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2601) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, K.Kahele, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-17 | House | Received from Governor re: Designating the Hawaii Department of Labor and Industrial Relations as the State's Health Insurance Exchange (Gov. Msg. No. 9). |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2145) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Harimoto, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-09-16 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-05-16 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-16 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HMS, JDL/WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2365 (Same As) 2016-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).