HI SB2893 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-15 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the definition of "chronically homeless individual" to provide clarity and improve the delivery and development of homeless services. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Chronically Homeless.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-15SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2020-07-10HouseReceived notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 633).
2020-07-10SenateSenate agrees with House amendments; passed Final Reading, as amended. Ayes, 25. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
2020-07-08SenateDeferred One Day 07-10-20.
2020-07-06SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 409).
2020-07-06HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-07-02HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 07-06-20.
2020-07-02HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1261-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-06-29HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi.
2020-06-26HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 06-29-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2020-05-11HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
2020-05-11HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1128-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-03-13HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Say.
2020-03-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 03-13-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 36
2020-03-03HousePass First Reading
2020-02-28HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 55) in amended form (SD 1).
2020-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-27SenateOne Day Notice 02-28-20.
2020-02-27SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2907) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2020-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-19-20 10:00AM in conference room 229.
2020-02-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
2020-02-11SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2465) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH.
2020-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2020-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-20 2:50PM in conference room 016.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to HMS, CPH.
2020-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2337 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback