HI SB2893 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates trust fund liability for any title 14, Hawaii Revised Statutes, tax that is passed on, and creates a conclusive presumption of, liability for any title 14 tax amounts passed on. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxes; Trust Fund Liability for Taxes Passed On

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2014-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-27-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2014-02-19HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 24
2014-02-18HousePass First Reading
2014-02-14HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 25) in amended form (SD 1).
2014-02-14SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2014-02-13SenateDeferred until 02-14-14.
2014-02-11Senate48 Hrs. Notice 02-13-14.
2014-02-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2014-02-11SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2189) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2014-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Tokuda.
2014-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-05-14 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2014-01-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-14 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2014-01-23SenateReferred to WAM.
2014-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2014-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2343 (Same As) 2014-01-27 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback