HI SB2888 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Re-referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Re-referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Access to Local Food Act to allow cottage food operations to sell cottage food products, under certain conditions, upon receiving a permit from the Department of Health. Effective 1/1/2023. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Economic Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Re-referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 374) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2888) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from AEN/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2634) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, San Buenaventura. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HTH, CPN . |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |