HI SB2888 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a statewide interoperable communications executive committee for public safety communications, statewide interoperable communications technical subcommittee to provide technical advice to the executive committee, and the position of the statewide interoperable communications coordinator. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Statewide Interoperable Public Safety Communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Technology and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Technology and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1106-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-03-13 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates. |
2020-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 03-13-20 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 420) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3226) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-26-20 1:10PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from PSM/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2751) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Moriwaki. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 1:25PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TEC, WAM/JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2332 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Subjects
Coordinator
Executive Committee
Statewide Interoperable Public Safety Communications
Technical Subcommittee
Executive Committee
Statewide Interoperable Public Safety Communications
Technical Subcommittee