HI SB288 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 180, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1294).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 180, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1294).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes motor vehicle and boat towing options for self-service storage facilities after sixty or more days of delinquency; provided that an occupant is provided notice. Requires owners to notify occupants via electronic mail or regular mail, except for the final demand and notice of sale, which must be provided via electronic mail and certified mail. Allows owners to publish notices of sales in any commercially reasonable manner, and conduct sales online. Requires limitations on value provisions to be provided for in a contract. Requires owners to notify occupants of the changes in the law. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Self-service Storage Facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Act 180, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1294). |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Act 180, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1294). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Oshiro voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 77) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 77). |
2017-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Nishimoto, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Ihara. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Say, Ward. |
2017-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 551). |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-07 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1750) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-04-05 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson. |
2017-04-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-05-17 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2017-03-29 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-05-17. |
2017-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-29-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1347) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-23 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Takayama, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Fukumoto. |
2017-03-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-23-17 2:05PM in conference room 329. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-17. |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 115) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 888) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-02-17 9:35AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 491) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-14-17 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-08-17 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB240 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Referred to TRN, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 1