HI SB2875 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Employment First"--defined as the competitive employment and full inclusion of persons with a disability in an integrated setting as a first and preferred option for employment services--as a policy of the State and counties. Requires state and county agencies to implement this policy in hiring practices and all programs and services administered or funded by the State or counties. Requires the Department of Human Services to apply Employment First principles to Medicaid home and community-based services programs. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1).
Title
Relating To Persons With Disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HMS/LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2408) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Misalucha. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/LCA, JDC/WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |