HI SB2871 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-13 - Act 012, 08/12/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-13 - Act 012, 08/12/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the contractors license board and real estate commission to adjust recovery fund and education fund fees to maintain a reasonable relation between the fees generated and the cost of services rendered by the funds. Caps the funds at amounts determined biennially by the contractors license board and real estate commission. Applies retroactively to 7/1/2020. Supersedes contrary amendments made by Act 29, Session Laws of Hawaii 2019. (HD3)
Title
Relating To Professional And Vocational Licensing Trust Funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Senate | Act 012, 08/12/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116). |
2020-08-13 | House | Act 012, on 08/12/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116). |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 632). |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 07-10-20. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 07-10-20. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 408). |
2020-07-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-07-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1260-20) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-06-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi. |
2020-06-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 06-29-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-06-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2). |
2020-06-25 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1213-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-06-24 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cachola, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Har, Mizuno. |
2020-06-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 06-24-20 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1084-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, McDermott. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Thursday, 03-12-20 9:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 409) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3194) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:40PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2789) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2315 (Same As) 2020-05-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Condominium Education Trust Fund
Contractors Education Fund
Contractors Recovery Fund
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Real Estate Education Fund
Real Estate Recovery Fund
Contractors Education Fund
Contractors Recovery Fund
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Real Estate Education Fund
Real Estate Recovery Fund