HI SB2861 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 212, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1321).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Public Safety to establish performance indicators. Requires annual reports of the established performance indicators, criminal offender treatment programs, and programs established pursuant to the Community Safety Act. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-11SenateAct 212, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1321).
2018-07-11HouseAct 212, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1321).
2018-05-03SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
2018-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
2018-05-01SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2018-05-01HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2018-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
2018-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 62-18) as amended in (CD 1).
2018-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
2018-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 62-18).
2018-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2018-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-23SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2018-04-17HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788).
2018-04-17SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Galuteria Co-Chair; L. Thielen.
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Takayama, Gates Co-Chairs; Say, Thielen.
2018-04-10HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778).
2018-04-10SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2018-04-10SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 532).
2018-04-06HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-04-06HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1913-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward.
2018-03-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2018-03-21HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, McKelvey, Souki, Todd, Ward excused (6).
2018-03-21HouseReported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1256-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-03-15HouseThe committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Creagan, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing.
2018-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-15-18 10:30AM in House conference room 312.
2018-03-08HouseReferred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 36
2018-03-08HousePass First Reading
2018-03-06HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 340) in amended form (SD 2).
2018-03-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2018-03-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
2018-03-02SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2841) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2018-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
2018-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2018-02-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2018-02-09SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2169) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2018-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-06-18 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2018-01-26SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-18 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2018-01-24SenateReferred to PSM, WAM.
2018-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback