HI SB285 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB285
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 476) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB285 (Carry Over) 2019-02-28 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.