HI SB2849 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Department of Health to create permanent or temporary Privacy Officer and Security Officer positions, exempt from civil service requirements. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Health; Information Privacy and Security; Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2014-02-12SenateReported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2223) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2014-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom.
2014-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-14 1:30PM in conference room 229.
2014-01-23SenateReferred to HTH, WAM.
2014-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2014-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2299 (Same As) 2014-03-06 - Referred to HTH, WAM.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback