HI SB2831 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Act 042, 06/12/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Reinstates the authority of the University of Hawaii President as the Chief Procurement Officer for contracts for construction and construction-related professional services furnished by licensees under chapter 464, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Requires the University of Hawaii to submit an annual report to the Legislature detailing all capital improvement projects approved by the Board of Regents no later than 20 days prior to each regular session. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Procurement For The University Of Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenateAct 042, 06/12/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142).
2018-06-13HouseAct 042, on 06/12/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142).
2018-05-03SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
2018-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
2018-05-01SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2018-05-01HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2018-04-27HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
2018-04-27HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 161-18) as amended in (CD 1).
2018-04-27Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
2018-04-27SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 161-18).
2018-04-27HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey.
2018-04-27SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, K. Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
2018-04-27SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 4:00 pm in conference room 429.
2018-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:30PM in conference room 429.
2018-04-24SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 2:30PM in conference room 429.
2018-04-17HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788).
2018-04-17SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs.
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, McKelvey, Holt Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Matsumoto.
2018-04-10HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778).
2018-04-10SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2018-04-10SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 528).
2018-04-06HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-04-06HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1920-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-04-04HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Holt, Todd.
2018-04-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2018-03-23HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
2018-03-23HouseReported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1490-18), recommending referral to FIN.
2018-03-22HouseThe committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Kong, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Quinlan.
2018-03-21HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-22-18 2:00PM in conference room 309.
2018-03-20HouseThe committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-22-18 at 2:00 PM.
2018-03-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-20-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309.
2018-03-16HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7).
2018-03-16HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1182-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED.
2018-03-15HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2018-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-15-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2018-03-08HouseReferred to LAB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 36
2018-03-08HousePass First Reading
2018-03-06HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 328) in amended form (SD 2).
2018-03-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2018-03-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
2018-03-02SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2916) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2018-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211.
2018-02-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2018-02-16SenateReported from GVO/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2468) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2018-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
2018-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, S. Chang, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on GVO/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 1:30PM in conference room 224.
2018-01-24SenateReferred to GVO/HRE, WAM.
2018-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2404 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - Referred to LAB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 9

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback