HI SB2830 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definitions of "board", "board business", and "meeting" within state open meetings law to expand the scope of the law to include state and county policymaking groups, including groups created by emergency proclamations. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2633) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Wakai. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-08-24 3:03PM; CR 225. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 3:10PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2168 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 2