HI SB2813 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Act 019, on 04/26/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Act 019, on 04/26/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the courts to provide information relating to adult guardianships to the Hawaii criminal justice data center to disclose to the Federal Bureau of Investigation National Instant Criminal Background Check System database for gun control purposes. Requires the Hawaii criminal justice data center to maintain orders of appointment or information from orders of appointment for use in firearms permitting and registration. Takes effect January 1, 2017. (SD1)
Title
Guardianship; Gun Control
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Act 019, on 04/26/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119). |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Act 019, 04/26/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119). |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 382). |
2016-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Tupola voting no (5) and Representative(s) Cachola, McKelvey, Oshiro, Rhoads, Thielen, Ward excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-04 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Rhoads, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2016-04-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1450-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-29 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, McDermott, Thielen. |
2016-03-29 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-29-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 262) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2689) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, K.Kahele, Kim. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-01-16 9:05AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2219) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2284 (Same As) 2016-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652).