HI SB281 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 060, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 060, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Health for collective bargaining requirements for ambulance providers and other current expenses. Requires the Department of Health to contract with the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration under the guidance of a steering committee to conduct a study of the State Emergency Medical System. Authorizes the Department of Health to establish a task force to develop a plan to implement findings and recommendations of the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration's study and any proposed legislation. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | Senate | Act 060, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161). |
2019-06-12 | House | Act 060, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 170) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 170). |
2019-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Luke, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:05PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Luke Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 732). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2184) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto. |
2019-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1444) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-14-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 86) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1025) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 105) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Health
Pre-Hospital Emergency Medical Services
State Emergency Medical System
Steering Committee
Study
Task Force
Department of Health
Pre-Hospital Emergency Medical Services
State Emergency Medical System
Steering Committee
Study
Task Force