HI SB280 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB280

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Codifies the administrative rule definition of "assistance animal". Clarifies the type of verification an individual may provide to substantiate a reasonable accommodation request for a specific assistance animal. Specifies that possession of a vest or other distinguishing animal garment, tag, or registration document commonly purchased online and purporting to identify an animal as a service animal or assistance animal does not constitute valid verification of a disability-related need for an assistance animal. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Fair Housing Reasonable Accommodations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-04-21SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 2:30PM; CR 329.
2021-04-20SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 2:30PM; CR 329.
2021-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
2021-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 808).
2021-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Kapela, Ward.
2021-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Ihara.
2021-04-15HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790).
2021-04-15SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2021-04-15SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 507).
2021-04-13HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ohno excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-04-09HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21.
2021-04-09HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1854) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-04-06HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-03-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-06-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-25HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-03-25HouseReported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1385) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-03-23HouseThe committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
2021-03-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-23-21 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 21
2021-03-09HousePass First Reading
2021-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 84).
2021-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-04SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-21.
2021-03-04SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 688) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2021-02-10SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 60) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2021-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-04-21 3:05PM in conference room 225.
2021-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 3:00PM in conference room 225.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to HMS, JDC.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB381 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB280 (Carry Over) 2021-04-21 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 2:30PM; CR 329.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback