HI SB2782 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to LHE, FIN , referral sheet 36
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Education to establish a plant-based food and beverage program to award funds to participating public schools who serve meals that include plant-based food options or plant-based milk options, under certain conditions. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To School Meals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseReferred to LHE, FIN , referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 368) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-03-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3332) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele.
2020-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:40PM in conference room 211.
2020-02-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2020-02-13SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2689) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2020-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2020-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-20 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2020-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback