HI SB2779 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases membership on the Hawaii Teacher Standards Board to include the Chairperson of the Native Hawaiian Education Council and a non-voting teacher candidate from a Hawaii educator preparation program at a public university. Clarifies that a permit is required for non-licensed teachers serving in public schools. (SB2779 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Teacher Standards Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1409-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Hashem, Ing, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey. |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:30PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 305) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2724) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:08AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from EDU/HWN/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2500) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, S. Chang, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Green. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/HWN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HWN/HRE, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2352 (Same As) 2018-06-22 - Act 050, 06/21/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1150).