HI SB2776 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires organ procurement organizations and transplant hospitals to procure and transplant medically suitable organs. Imposes administrative fines and loss of accreditation for failure to comply.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anatomical Gifts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-10 (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
2010-02-10 (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
2010-02-09 (S) The committee(s) on HTH/CPN deferred the measure until 02-10-10 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2010-02-03 (S) The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-10 9:00am in conference room 229.
2010-01-27 (S) Referred to HTH/CPN, JGO.
2010-01-27 (S) Passed First Reading.
2010-01-25 (S) Introduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback