HI SB2775 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes within the Department of Public Safety Reentry Office, a 5-year Recidivism Prevention Pilot Program, consisting of three components: the housing voucher program, child care voucher program, and income tax credit for employers to assist the reentry efforts of certain individuals who exited from the Women's Community Correctional Center, for two years after the exit. Establishes five Transition Navigator positions (5.00 FTE) within the Department of Public Safety Reentry Office. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Recidivism Prevention.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HMS, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2310 (Same As) 2022-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Correctional Facilities
Department of Public Safety
Recidivism Prevention Pilot Program
Reentry Office
Correctional Facilities
Department of Public Safety
Recidivism Prevention Pilot Program
Reentry Office
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2775&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2775_.HTM |