HI SB2773 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 4:30pm in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 4:30pm in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies the qualifications and procedures for the licensing and regulation of third party administrators, with the aim of encouraging the disclosure of contracts between insurers and administrators and promoting financial responsibility of administrators. (SB2773 HD2)
Title
Relating To Third Party Administrators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 4:30pm in conference room 229. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-18 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; S. Chang, Espero, Tokuda. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Takumi, Cullen Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Ward. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 596). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1977-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Holt, Todd. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1327-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, LoPresti, Say, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Mizuno, McDermott. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-20-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1186-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Ito, LoPresti, Onishi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tokioka, Woodson. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 03-14-18 9:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 301) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2903) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:08AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2251) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-06-18 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-02-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-18 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2346 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).