HI SB2766 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 251, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1354).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 251, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1354).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the insurance code by removing or revising certain provisions that relate to the licensing and regulation of mutual benefit societies, fraternal benefit societies, and health maintenance organizations; updates financial regulatory requirements and certain fees to be more consistent with requirements placed on traditional insurance companies. (CD1)
Title
Insurance; Insurance Commissioner; Regulated Entities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 251, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1354). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 251, on 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1354). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-02 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 87-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 87-12). | |
2012-04-27 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Herkes, Morikawa, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 2:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-12 9:45AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 755). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Espero, Co-Chair(s); Kouchi, Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Herkes, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Mizuno, Pine. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 485). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ching, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1599-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-30-12 3:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1214-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Coffman, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Marumoto, Thielen; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Herkes, Carroll, Ching. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-19-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1045-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Pine. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-13-12 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 293) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2741) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on on 02-23-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2036) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to CPN, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2504 (Same As) 2012-02-17 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, M. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa excused (5).