HI SB2756 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allocates cost share among highway agencies and utilities for projects involving the removal, relocation, replacement, or reconstruction of utility facilities that border state or county highways. Clarifies federal funding share for cost of undergrounding utility facilities. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2756 HD1)
Title
Highway; Cost Sharing; Utility Owners; Right-of-Way; Relocation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-17-10 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Berg, Keith-Agaran, Manahan, Takumi, Thielen excused (5). | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 705-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2010-03-08 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Awana, Aquino, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Rhoads. | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-08-10 9:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 260) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2486) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from CPN/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2250) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Sakamoto, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Espero, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-10 10:45am in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to CPN/TIA, WAM. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2603 (Same As) 2010-03-03 - (S) Referred to CPN, WAM.