HI SB2751 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-04 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-04 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the Hawaii health corps program and Hawaii rural health care provider loan repayment program to include incentives for psychologists and social workers. Makes the department of health responsible for administering the Hawaii rural health care provider loan repayment program. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1795 (Same As) 2022-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HET with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Health Corps Program
Hawaii Rural Health Care Provider Loan Repayment Program
Psychologists
Social Workers
Hawaii Health Corps Program
Hawaii Rural Health Care Provider Loan Repayment Program
Psychologists
Social Workers
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2751&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2751_.HTM |