HI SB2735 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Re-Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM/JDL.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Re-Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM/JDL.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the counties to accept the surrender of a private road if there has been no act of private ownership for five years. Exempts the State and counties from maintaining surrendered roads and from liability for lack of maintenance or for maintenance performed prior to assuming ownership.
Title
Private Roads; Repair and Maintenance
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM/JDL. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TRE/PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2049 (Same As) 2016-07-01 - Act 194, 07/01/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1296).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2735&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2735_.HTM |