HI SB2727 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-22 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 791).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-22 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 791).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows condominiums to be eligible for commercial property assessed financing. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 791). |
2024-04-19 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Sayama, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Tam, Pierick. |
2024-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 694). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Wakai, Fukunaga Co-Chairs; Awa. |
2024-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 709). |
2024-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1835-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-03 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cochran; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos, Ward. |
2024-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-24 2:15PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4). |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1199-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-12 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates. |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-12-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 187) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2816) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Inouye. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-24 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2387) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |