HI SB2715 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Agriculture to adopt rules to protect the welfare of livestock transported to, from, or between any island of Hawaii. Requires the department to adopt interim rules.
Title
Relating To Livestock Transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-20 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN/TRS, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1898 (Same As) 2020-01-29 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2715&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2715_.HTM |