HI SB2708 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $100,000 to the Department of Defense for the installation of new outdoor sirens in the Salt Lake area of Oahu.
Title
Relating To Emergencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1834 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2708&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2708_.HTM |