HI SB2707 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the employer to initiate negotiations on repricing of classes within a bargaining unit within thirty days of the employer's receipt of the exclusive representative's written request to negotiate. Establishes that the employer's failure to initiate the negotiation within such time frame or the parties' failure to reach an agreement within ninety days of the exclusive representative's written request to negotiate or by January 31 of a year in which the collective bargaining agreement is due to expire, whichever is earlier, constitutes an impasse to which the impasse procedures in section 89-11, Hawaii Revised Statutes, shall apply. Effective 7/1/2022. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Collective Bargaining.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216) |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1216) |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 111-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 111-22). |
2022-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Rhoads, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 224. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-22 10:35AM; Conference Room 224. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Sayama Co-Chairs; Okimoto. |
2022-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 880). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Chang, Fevella. |
2022-04-08 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-08-22. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 391). |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1673-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, McDermott. |
2022-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-31-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1393-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 03-22-22 9:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 539) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-22. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report filed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 1 offered. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2958) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2525) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 3:15PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |