HI SB2701 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 8 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 8 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants county agencies the right to enter property to investigate agricultural buildings for violations of and compliance with building permit and building code exemption requirements. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Agricultural Buildings.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2020-07-08 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 630). |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Keith-Agaran. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 07-08-20. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 07-08-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Deferred One Day 07-06-20. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Deferred One Day 07-02-20. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 371). |
2020-06-30 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-06-29 | House | Deferred one day 06-30-20. |
2020-06-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 06-29-20. |
2020-06-26 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1230-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-06-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Thielen. |
2020-06-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 06-24-20 3:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-05-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1166-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-03-13 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2020-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 03-13-20 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD , referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 339). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3167) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-20 12:00PM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported from PSM/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2487) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM/AEN, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |