HI SB2699 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Pulehunui community development district on the island of Maui as a community development district within the authority of the Hawaii Community Development Authority. Authorizes the Hawaii Community Development Authority to obtain various forms of financial aid from the federal government for projects of the authority.
Title
Relating To Development Districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1928 (Same As) 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2699&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2699_.HTM |