HI SB2692 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates money out of the land conservation fund for the acquisition of a portion of the Na Wai Eha watershed in Wailuku, Maui. Requires the County of Maui to provide matching funds for the land acquisition or for the purchase of the associated water systems and easements. Effective 7/1/2051. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Na Wai Eha Watershed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1169-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-11-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 334) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3310) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2651) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee on WTL will reconsider its previous decision on 02-03-20 and will hold a public decision making on 02-07-20 1:40PM in conference room 224. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-20 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2555 (Same As) 2020-02-05 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).