HI SB2684 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies restrictions relating to certain classes of permits and the issuance thereof, as well as methods for determining fees, for state small boat harbors.
Title
Relating To State Small Boat Harbor Permits And Fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2684&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2684_.HTM |