HI SB2674 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Codifies Goal 13 of the United Nations' 2030 Agenda for Sustainable Development to take urgent action to combat climate change and its impact. (SB2674 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Sustainable Development Goals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7).
2018-03-16HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1161-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB.
2018-03-13HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2018-03-12HouseRe-referred to EEP, EDB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 38
2018-03-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-13-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2018-03-08HouseReferred to EEP, EDB, JUD, referral sheet 36
2018-03-08HousePass First Reading
2018-03-06HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 265) in amended form (SD 1).
2018-03-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2018-03-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
2018-03-02SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2863) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2018-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai.
2018-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-18 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2018-02-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2018-02-05SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2033) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2018-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Nishihara.
2018-01-26SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-18 1:15PM in conference room 224.
2018-01-24SenateReferred to AEN, WAM.
2018-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback