HI SB2664 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies sustainable development Goals 1 and 3 based on the United Nations' Global Goals into the Hawaii State Planning Act. (SB2664 HD1)
Title
Relating To Sustainable Development Goals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1200-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 03-14-18 8:40AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HHS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 258) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2569) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2064) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |