HI SB2664 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JGO.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JGO.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the identity theft offenses and the definition of "personal information" in chapter 708, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to clarify that the identity theft offenses include the transmission of personal information of an actual person, alive or dead, or a fictitious person.
Title
Identity Theft
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JGO. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2134) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JGO. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Slom. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-10 1:30pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to EDT, JGO. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2511 (Same As) 2010-01-27 - (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 7