HI SB2663 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to HHS/AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to HHS/AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies sustainable development goals based on the United Nations' Global Goal two, zero hunger. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Sustainable Development Goals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HHS/AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 257) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2695) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2264) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-18 3:45PM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |