HI SB266 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB266
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys. Exempts any person from the post-arrival mandatory selfquarantine if the person receives a negative test result prior to arrival. Allows the governor to establish statewide conditions for exemption. Requires certain COVID-19 tests for travelers who do not have a test result upon arrival to avoid mandatory self-quarantine. Requires any person who does not obtain a negative test result for COVID-19 pre-arrival to be responsible for all costs associated with that person's mandatory self-quarantine. Prohibits the suspension of the quarantine requirements except by legislative approval via a concurrent resolution. Repeals quarantine requirements on 12/31/2021. Requires that should any project or program related to COVID-19 response efforts paid for by state funds later become eligible for federal reimbursement, those federal funds shall be deposited into the general fund. Lapses funds from the major disaster fund to the general fund on 7/1/2021. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Coronavirus 2019 Pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-04-07 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-04-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-07-21 1:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-31 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-07-21. |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Tokioka, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1353) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, Mizuno, Wildberger, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McKelvey; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to PDP, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 186) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 949) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-04-21 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-24-21 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 135) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB266 (Carry Over) 2021-04-07 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.