HI SB2654 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts any development of homestead lots or housing for the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands from general excise and use taxes. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reported from HWN/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2225) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Ihara, Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HWN/HOU, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2034 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2