HI SB2649 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that the adjudicatory functions of the public utilities commission are exempt from part I of Hawaii's Sunshine Law, relating to meetings; provided that the non-adjudicatory functions of the commission shall be subject to part I of the Sunshine Law. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Public Utilities Commission.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2018-02-16SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2434) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2018-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Ruderman; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Nishihara.
2018-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-13-18 10:00AM in conference room 229.
2018-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-12-18 10:00AM in conference room 229.
2018-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-18 10:00AM in conference room 229.
2018-01-24SenateReferred to CPH, JDC.
2018-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback