HI SB2645 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Waives the medical licensing fees for physicians licensed to practice medicine and prescribe prescription medication in the State of Hawaii, provided that no less than twenty per cent of their patient case load is Medicaid or Medicaid-like patients.
Title
Waives medical licensing fees provided that no less than twenty per cent of their patient case load is Medicaid or Medicaid-like patients.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-10 2:30pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to HMS/CPN, WAM. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2645&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2645_.HTM |