HI SB2643 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Includes coercion as a means of committing the offense of sex trafficking. Removes the criminal statute of limitations for sex trafficking and promoting prostitution. Specifies that sex trafficking of a minor is a strict liability offense. Repeals the offense of solicitation of a minor for prostitution. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Sex Trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
2020-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-16-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 314) in amended form (SD 1).
2020-03-03SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2020-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3021) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2020-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella.
2020-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-20 9:15AM in conference room 016.
2020-01-29SenateRe-Referred to JDC.
2020-01-23SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2020-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback