HI SB2636 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Re-Referred to EDU/HRE, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Re-Referred to EDU/HRE, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires entities with state education programs or activities, or that receive state funding for educational programs or activities, to adopt written policies and undertake other specified actions no later than 1/1/2023. Requires annual reports to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Civil Rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU/HRE, JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from EDU/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2404) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Wakai. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 3:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HRE, JDC. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1775 (Same As) 2022-05-04 - Transmitted to Governor.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Education
Educational Programs and Activities
Reporting
Sex Discrimination
Title IX Corollary
Education
Educational Programs and Activities
Reporting
Sex Discrimination
Title IX Corollary