HI SB2622 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies which veterans qualify for civil service hiring preference.
Title
Civil Service; Veteran's Preference
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee on PSM deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee on LBR deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM/LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-10 1:20pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to PSM/LBR. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2273 (Same As) 2010-02-12 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Cabanilla, Takumi excused (3).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2622&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2622_.HTM |