HI SB2621 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Re-Referred to CPH/AEN, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Re-Referred to CPH/AEN, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the chemicals homosalate, octocrylene, and octisalate to the sale and distribution sunscreen ban beginning on 1/1/2021. Allows the Department of Health to adopt rules to add additional harmful chemicals to the sale and distribution ban. Requires and appropriates funds for the University of Hawaii to conduct a study to examine the concurrent effects of certain sunscreen products on the decline of the State's coral reefs. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Water Pollution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/AEN, JDC/WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from CPH/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2720) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Ruderman, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH/AEN, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1860 (Same As) 2020-02-12 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Health
Distribution
Prohibition
Study
Sunscreen
University of Hawaii
Water Pollution
Department of Health
Distribution
Prohibition
Study
Sunscreen
University of Hawaii
Water Pollution